Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WILLINGDON

Charity number: 1133784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Trevor John Amey Chair 29 April 2019
None on record
Rev Danny Lee Pegg Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Rev Adam John Ransom Trustee 22 January 2022
None on record
Melissa Green Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Susan Foster Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Christine Wragg Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Stephanie Anderson Trustee 10 May 2021
None on record
Pollyanne Stone-Lee Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
Ronald James Tomsett Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Valerie Winslade Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Rev Susan Ann Wilkinson Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Olaf Hoeg Trustee 05 April 2017
None on record
JEREMY CHRISTOPHER QUILLER ROWETT Trustee 09 May 2013
None on record
PAUL WILLIAM MARTIN Trustee 24 May 2011
None on record
LYNDA ELIZABETH BISHOP Trustee
None on record