PERSIAN SEPHARDI SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 1132415
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £102.13k £152.63k £152.63k £151.41k £100.87k
Total expenditure £120.64k £120.38k £110.31k £127.55k £100.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A