PERSIAN SEPHARDI SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance worship in the Sephardi tradition through the organisation and administration of a Jewish Synagogue in such parts of London, the United Kingdom and the world as the Trustees may from time to time think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 30 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL HAKIMIAN | Chair |
|
||||||
SAMUEL GORJIAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEX BASSALIAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.87k | £121.90k | £125.34k | £123.32k | £198.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.77k | £109.98k | £112.20k | £120.68k | £158.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE WORSHIP IN THE SEPHARDI TRADITION INCLUDING THROUGH THE ORGANISATION AND ADMINISTRATION OF A JEWISH SYNAGOGUE IN SUCH PARTS OF LONDON, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION FOR THE SEPHARDIC JEWISH COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF LONDON, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LONDON, UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
P O BOX 2402
LONDON
N3 3WE
- Phone:
- 0207 328 3272
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window