Financial history METHODIST CHURCH IN TOWER HAMLETS

Charity number: 1134888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £608.53k £491.87k £455.89k £335.35k £486.09k
Total expenditure £773.07k £857.12k £1.31m £883.82k £1.01m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £160.96k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £4.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £14.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £291.80k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £136.56k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £698.55k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £74.52k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £32.95k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £73.89k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A