THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD

Charity number: 1134798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barbara Minett Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Melvin Morris Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Maureen Peat Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Madge Elizabeth Marshall Trustee 23 April 2017
Y-NOTTS Received: On time
Laura Marshall Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Pamela Morris Trustee 24 April 2015 None on record
Rosemarie Poffley Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Kathleen Clifford Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
TIMOTHY CRAIG GUY Trustee 27 February 2013 None on record
Elizabeth Katherine Guy Trustee 23 April 2017 None on record
John Naylor Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record