THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, SLAUGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the whole mission of the church (pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical) within the eclesiatical parish comprising the villages of Handcross, Pease Pottage, Slaugham and Warninglid.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- SLAUGHAM PCC (Working name)
- West Weald Parish (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CARL ALEXANDER SMITH | Chair | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Louise Moss | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Dawn Cox | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Robert Howard | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hawksley | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elizabeth Gregory | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Venetia Reynolds | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shana Clare Fleming | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Arnold | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
FRANK MOSS | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Howard Tomlinson | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA BUTFOY | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAN ELLIOTT | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICK GROSE | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNA SESEMANN | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.54k | £157.63k | £113.49k | £123.73k | £466.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.15k | £142.96k | £127.18k | £118.66k | £135.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RECTORY
BRIGHTON ROAD
HANDCROSS
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 6BU
- Phone:
- 01444400221
- Email:
- slaugham@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window