THE METHODIST CHURCH - SHERWOOD FOREST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mansfield Methodist Circuit encourages the provision of regular acts of worship open to members of the church and non-members alike. We provide sacred spaces (buildings) for prayer and contemplation, the teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and smaller groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

36 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 27 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- 08 December 2021: Funds received from 1161309 NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HOMELESS EYECARE
- MANSFIELD METHODIST CIRCUIT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
36 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stuart Ellis | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Adele Stenton | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Ellis | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Ellis | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Amanda Walters | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Taylor | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ann Gibson | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Gibson | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Bray | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Daykin | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Baird | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rosemary Westby | Trustee | 05 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Enid Mary Marsh | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Head | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Cullen | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Richard Bonsall | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Sutton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ANDREW CRANE | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV Debra Jane Keegan | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVE KEEGAN | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Crane | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev LINDA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BARRY DARLINGTON BSc, PGCE | Trustee | 03 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ANN INCE | Trustee | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ANN GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 21 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CREE | Trustee | 01 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT VICKERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP ROY SHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN ELIZABETH VICKERS RGN,DIP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS PAM CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVEREND BOB JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT FENNELL C TEXT ATI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MILSON WILMOT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joyce Elizabeth Cree | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRIE ROBERT RICHMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.11k | £283.19k | £339.15k | £292.77k | £304.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £318.11k | £309.56k | £326.09k | £278.77k | £288.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 November 2023 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 November 2023 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 November 2023 | 511 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 November 2023 | 511 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) AS AMENDED BY STATUTORY INSTRUMENT DATED 16 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Windsor Road
MANSFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG18 4ED
- Phone:
- 01623 623192
- Email:
- stuartellis.sfmc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window