THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HYSON GREEN AND FOREST FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Include, regular public worship open to all and pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Special services for funerals, weddings and baptism. Specific activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers, youth and special needs groups, including vulnerable families. These groups are open to all. Specific support for those seeking asylum. Supports charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 21 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST STEPHEN WITH ST PAUL HYSON GREEN (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aleena Paul David | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan julian | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carron Gawthorn | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Babatunde Femi Olajuyigbe | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Burrows | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deidre Dixon | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mark Paget | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tamim Fetrat | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Folasade Abiodun Sowunmi | Trustee | 24 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY SILCOCK | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ashtari | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Albert Gill | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHARON BRAVO | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jean Kingston McCloughry | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lewin | Trustee | 16 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM JAMES LEWIN | Trustee | 21 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev CLIVE BURROWS | Trustee |
|
||||||
SANDRA BRAILSFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ANTHONY DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.58k | £81.10k | £62.37k | £95.34k | £99.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.81k | £92.18k | £83.09k | £87.48k | £100.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 HARTINGTON ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 2GU
- Phone:
- 01159115737
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window