Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HINCKLEY ST. MARY THE VIRGIN
Charity number: 1134794
Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Cattell | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Richard Hill | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joy Allman | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Harris | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Duane Daniel Mellor | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Elizabeth Simpson | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Liz Seal | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judy Williams | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MOORE | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Don Wright | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Ann Alesbrook | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Pettit | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELISA JAYNE SIMMONS | Trustee | 11 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN ROWTON WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUE GRIFFIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEVERLY JAYNE FRETTSOME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH CHRISTINE DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VAL CARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISTAIR MORTON CROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.