Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN'S, HURST GREEN, SURREY

Charity number: 1133107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Susan Bosley Chair 31 January 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Parker Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Samuel Strolz Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Helen Ainsworth Trustee 01 November 2021
THE CORPORATION OF THE CHURCH HOUSE
Received: On time
Hilary Dilnot Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
John Lavabre Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Charlotte Nicholls Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Peter Langham Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Sara Bartolozzi Trustee 13 September 2020
None on record
Barbara Richards Trustee 13 September 2020
None on record
Rev Charles Bradshaw Trustee 13 September 2020
None on record
Emma Watts Trustee 13 September 2020
None on record
Julian Taylor Trustee 13 May 2019
None on record
Wendy Anne Hewitt Trustee 05 November 2018
None on record
Henk Van Den Berg Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Christopher Charles Johns Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
CATHY BOOTH Trustee 06 April 2014
None on record
THE REVD PROFESSOR MARY JOAN SELLER Trustee
OXTED UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JANET MARGARET HARMAN Trustee
None on record
MONICA MARJORIE FENTON Trustee
None on record