THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, FELPHAM

Charity number: 1133732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £163.96k £164.75k £152.87k £142.54k £133.86k
Total expenditure £167.21k £182.28k £168.31k £170.03k £112.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £7.50k