THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT JOHN ON BETHNAL GREEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 16 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN ON BETHNAL GREEN PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Darren John Wolf | Chair | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Shaw | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Paul Kelly | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Morine Charles | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joy Madeline Stanton | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lois Lewington | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARE JANE BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA JEAN PERROTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBRA MAY FRAME | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.30k | £134.30k | £70.81k | £97.99k | £88.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.70k | £159.70k | £83.98k | £83.14k | £105.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 February 2021 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 February 2021 | 115 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Crypt - St. John On Bethnal Green Church
200 Cambridge Heath Road
LONDON
E2 9PA
- Phone:
- 020 8880 6743
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window