THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, ENFIELD HIGHWAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St James Church is a Christian community which exists to worship & give glory to God. We seek to share the faith & speak of Christ to our community in a welcoming way that is also grounded in reality,encouraging,loving & valuable.We believe that all have a part to play in our common life,seek through friendship, fellowship, care & prayer to minister the light and love of Christ in every situation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Enfield
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES PCC, ENFIELD HIGHWAY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV IAN GALLAGHER | Chair | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sanday Patrick Nyerende | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Perry | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hawkes | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Kai Mason Leighton | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Isichei | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dorah Allen Sabiiti | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Monica Pernella Robinson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Harvey | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwenllian Mair Tucker | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Griffiths | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Field | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIAN SHIRLEY ANN JACOBS | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.02k | £116.98k | £128.03k | £133.40k | £149.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.42k | £81.85k | £112.33k | £94.95k | £100.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 ASCOT GARDENS
ENFIELD
EN3 5RS
- Phone:
- 02088041456
- Website:
-
stjameschurch.cc
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window