Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN WITH ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, PADDINGTON

Charity number: 1132885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £572.36k £549.68k £583.82k £492.97k £536.77k
Total expenditure £489.34k £499.90k £515.99k £492.04k £487.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.57k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £358.30k £345.93k £476.67k N/A £305.96k
Income - Other trading activities £192.91k £112.21k £78.00k N/A £82.66k
Income - Charitable activities £21.03k £91.51k £29.14k N/A £148.15k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £129 £27 £9 N/A £5
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £2.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £466.00k £460.12k £503.18k N/A £450.94k
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.34k £34.68k £7.81k N/A £30.54k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £5.00k N/A £5.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £5.10k £5.00k N/A £5.87k