THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, NOTTING HILL

Charity number: 1133807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time Download