THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, NOTTING HILL

Charity number: 1133807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £365.49k £228.32k £489.88k £446.51k £599.10k
Total expenditure £385.59k £226.18k £414.92k £413.44k £641.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £91.91k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £305.75k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £293.31k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £42
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £641.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0