THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, NOTTING HILL

Charity number: 1133807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Louise Raspin Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Christopher East Trustee 15 January 2018 None on record
Tommaso Crackett Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Helen Doery Trustee 28 April 2018 None on record
Andrew Simmons Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
K Jonas Masahi Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Jean Ross Russell Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
JAMES STEEL Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Sandra Crane Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
William Josten Trustee 26 October 2020
ST PETER'S HALL (1991) CHARITY Received: On time
Andrew Colvin Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record
Jennifer Marie Josten Trustee 27 May 2021 None on record
Amooti Nakabiri Binaisa Trustee 26 October 2020
ST PETER'S HALL (1991) CHARITY Received: On time
Reverend Pat Allerton Chair 12 September 2017
ST PETER'S HALL (1991) CHARITY Received: On time
Bethany Hutchinson Trustee 26 October 2020 None on record