ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHIPPING NORTON, PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1132070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £166.07k £177.81k £325.29k £224.29k £994.91k
Total expenditure £170.95k £174.43k £214.54k £282.94k £406.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £3.00k £17.60k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £987.54k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.92k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £447
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £391.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.51k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £360
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £139.82k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0