Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, CHICHESTER

Charity number: 1133785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 14 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window