Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WADHURST

Charity number: 1132389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Dr Paul Ronald Ratcliff Chair 23 January 2019
None on record
Right Honourable Paul Kenneth Burstow Trustee 28 August 2022
SOCIAL CARE INSTITUTE FOR EXCELLENCE
Received: 9 days late
Mary Everdell Burstow Trustee 28 August 2022
None on record
Anthony Dunnett Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
Ruth Elizabeth Dunnett Trustee 28 November 2021
None on record
Dr Heather Jane Ratcliff Trustee 28 November 2021
None on record
Michael John Bradford Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Dr Miquela Pumela Walsh Trustee 22 October 2020
AFRICAN SCHOLARS' FUND (UK)
Received: On time
Lesley Wardrop Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Penny Dobson Trustee 30 September 2019
None on record
Andrew Martin Lindsay Trustee 31 March 2016
None on record
Peter Barrie Thompson Trustee 01 December 2014
THE MULLINS MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Vanessa Julia Collier Sharman Trustee 01 April 2014
TUNBRIDGE WELLS STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
Lynda Joy Wight Trustee 13 April 2013
None on record
CHRISTINE Patricia BITHELL Trustee 18 July 2012
None on record
J M HARDCASTLE Trustee
THE WHILIGH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PAUL ADRIAN STEPHENS Trustee
None on record