THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, SPROTBROUGH WITH ST EDMUND, ANCHORAGE LANE

Charity number: 1133069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 August 2017 On time Download