THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, SPROTBROUGH WITH ST EDMUND, ANCHORAGE LANE

Charity number: 1133069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £94.51k £141.38k £242.73k £117.94k £102.60k
Total expenditure £101.89k £199.15k £101.39k £109.50k £110.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £256 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k