Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, LILLINGTON, LEAMINGTON SPA
Charity number: 1132178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Smith | Chair | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Pritchard | Trustee | 12 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Cerys Jane Smith | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niel Strydom | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara-Jane Snatt | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Jamie | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Druce | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ann Dean | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Duff | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diana Taulbut | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Butler | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Mary Hucklesby | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE BUTLER | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rosemary Caroline Pantling | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev S Fairhurst | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Marjorie Stevens | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM EDWARD COOPER | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|||||
MRS PATRICIA POULSON | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH BOAD BSC CENG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN STUART INNES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.