Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE, ASHTON UPON MERSEY

Charity number: 1133105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window