Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE, ASHTON UPON MERSEY

Charity number: 1133105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE REVEREND STEPHEN BRIAN RANKIN Chair
SALE WEST COMMUNITY URBAN TRUST
Received: On time
John William Vaughan Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Graham Charles Fosh Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
IAN THWAITES Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Frances Margaret Hyde Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Keast Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Dave Atkinson Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Elaine Christine Jones Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
ANN MCBURNEY Trustee 24 April 2016
TRAFFORD YOUTH FOR CHRIST
Received: 1 day late
HELEN ANNE JARVIS Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
Matthew James Kay Trustee 24 April 2016
None on record
BRIAN MACFADEN Trustee 26 April 2015
SALE WEST COMMUNITY URBAN TRUST
Received: On time
JEFFREY MCBURNEY Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
JEREMY BARNES Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
GILL HART Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
LORNA ELLEN HITCHIN Trustee 18 July 2012
None on record
JOAN MARGARET HEYS Trustee
None on record
AVTAR DAVINDAR SINGH DIGGWA Trustee
None on record
JANET VIVIENNE DARLOW Trustee
None on record
BARBARA ANNE SHIMMINGS Trustee
None on record
ROSEMARY GILLIAN SIGEE Trustee
None on record