Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE, THURNBY, LEICESTER

Charity number: 1133016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Rob Miles Chair 01 August 2018
None on record
Kathrine Lount Trustee 26 April 2022
None on record
Russell Bentley Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
Judith Heatley Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
Julie Tregoning Trustee 26 April 2021
None on record
Mark Potterton Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
Rev Thomas Devas Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
Richard Koelling Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record
Deborah Slinger Trustee 21 April 2016
None on record
MR CHRIS GOODMAN Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH JANE SMITH Trustee
None on record
Rev HELEN BENCE Trustee
None on record
MR TERRY SHAW Trustee
None on record