THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES, LECKHAMPTON WITH ST CHRISTOPHER'S, WARDEN HILL

Charity number: 1134837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download