THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES, LECKHAMPTON WITH ST CHRISTOPHER'S, WARDEN HILL

Charity number: 1134837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

34 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Winifred Thornton Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
Brian William Miles Trustee 28 April 2018 None on record
Anne Louise Jones Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
Dr RACHEL ANNE TARLING MB CHB Trustee 27 August 2012 None on record
Richard Alan Cypher Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record
MAUREEN ROSE MCBANE Trustee None on record
PETER GERARD JOHN SANDS Trustee None on record
Gillian Steels Trustee 30 May 2013 None on record
CAROLE ANN PENNINGTON Trustee 27 August 2012 None on record
Alison Neale Trustee 12 April 2019 None on record
PAMELA WENDY DAINTON B.ED. OXON Trustee None on record
PROFESSOR CLAIR EVELYN DRUCE CHILVERS DSC Trustee 04 April 2017
MENTAL HEALTH RESEARCH UK Received: On time
THE MCPIN FOUNDATION Received: On time
DAVID JOHN HENRY MACE Trustee None on record
Alan John Borman Bishop Trustee 12 April 2019 None on record
SARA Margaret Trevelyan TURNER Trustee
VOLUNTARY SCHOOLS FUND OF GLOUCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION Received: On time
THE DIOCESE OF GLOUCESTER EDUCATION TRUST Received: On time
BISHOP HEADLAM FUND Received: On time
Stuart Hutton Trustee 28 April 2018
CATHARINE BALL FOR ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
DARYL SCOTT BURNS Trustee None on record
Ian Michael Jones Trustee 02 April 2019
CHELTENHAM CHORAL SOCIETY Received: On time
HAZEL MARGARET MACE Trustee None on record
JANINA CHRISTINE LANGDON Trustee 07 June 2012 None on record
Robert William Allard Trustee 12 April 2019 None on record
Alison Clare Cattanach Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record
P Virginia Paget Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
Dorothy Baker Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Peter John Cottingham Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
EILEEN ATTWOOD Trustee 27 August 2012 None on record
DIANA ROSEMARY MILES Trustee 27 August 2012 None on record
Royston McBane Trustee None on record
PATRICIA MAUREEN HAYWARD Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
NICK DAVIES Chair 07 June 2012 None on record
Richard W Neale Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Roger James Sumner Trustee 02 April 2019 None on record
Katie Blaney Trustee 04 April 2017 None on record
Rev Gary Grady Trustee 20 September 2016
LECKHAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, LECKHAMPTON Received: On time
ST PETER AND ST PAUL, LECKHAMPTON WELFARE TRUST Received: On time