THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT ALBAN THE MARTYR, HOLBORN WITH SAINT PETER, SAFFRON HILL

Charity number: 1135568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER HARRY LOMAX Trustee 30 April 2017
ST URSULA'S HOME Received: On time
WESTMINSTER HOUSE YOUTH CLUB Received: On time
WESTMINSTER HOUSE YOUTH CLUB Recently registered
PETER JOHN BITHELL Trustee None on record
Dr ROBERT WILLIAM WALKER Trustee None on record
EDWARD GILES HOWARD BATTING Trustee None on record
LOUISE KAREN RANDALL Trustee 18 October 2020 None on record
SIMON JEREMY JONES Trustee None on record
Stephanie Jane Ellner Trustee 12 May 2019 None on record
Rev RONALD GEOFFREY CORP Trustee None on record
Rev EDWARD WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER CARR Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
Rev CHRISTOPHER SMITH Chair 07 July 2011
ST URSULA'S HOME Received: On time
CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY Received: On time
STAFFORD'S CHARITY Received: On time
David Christopher Ballance Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
SIMON EDWARD JONES MA Trustee None on record
Jason Philip Burch Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
ALISON RUTH LE ROY DURSTON CRATCHLEY Trustee None on record
Neil James Wilson Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Ruth Hanson Trustee 12 May 2019 None on record
Dr TONY ALBERT TROWLES Trustee
ASCOT PRIORY Received: On time