THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW AND ST NATHANAEL, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1134719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £230.53k £283.87k £344.23k £228.50k £239.14k
Total expenditure £257.67k £246.02k £251.88k £244.28k £248.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £60.96k £92.76k £96.94k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A