THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW AND ST NATHANAEL, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1134719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KYLE DOUGLAS Trustee 21 May 2013 None on record
SIMON PUGH-JONES Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
Fabian Breckels Trustee 07 April 2019
WE THE CURIOUS LIMITED Received: On time
RUTH RIMMER Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Chris Smith Trustee 22 April 2013 None on record
Kevin Froud Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Laura Protheroe Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Alison Edmonds Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
KATHERYN CAITHNESS Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
David Aberdeen Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
ANDREW LUCAS Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
ANDREW WOOD Trustee 30 April 2012
DEMENTIA MATTERS - HERE (FORDSHIRE) Received: On time