THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH BOUGHTON MONCHELSEA

Charity number: 1136147
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 November 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 November 2020 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 January 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 January 2020 68 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 August 2016 On time Download