THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH BOUGHTON MONCHELSEA

Charity number: 1136147
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £150.75k £146.26k £130.66k £128.47k £136.96k
Total expenditure £144.05k £143.65k £144.46k £127.79k £136.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £215 £1.65k £2.50k £1.72k £9.28k