THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER'S CHURCH BOUGHTON MONCHELSEA

Charity number: 1136147
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeanette Ruth Coster Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Michael William Coltham Trustee 29 April 2013 None on record
ALAN MCINTYRE Trustee 02 September 2011 None on record
ANNE NORRIS Trustee 29 July 2011 None on record
Belinda May Knowler Trustee 29 April 2013 None on record
Nicholas Geoffrey Willoughby Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
Rev Philip Goodey Chair 15 October 2015
THE PRINCESS PROJECT Received: On time
Bryan Wilfrid Phillip Price Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record