THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, RANMOOR, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1135432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £234.16k £223.71k £317.17k £534.45k £277.19k
Total expenditure £193.08k £273.83k £299.55k £215.20k £333.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £186.03k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £26.41k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.48k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £319.53k N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £12.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £215.20k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £4.20k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A