THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAELS, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 1132915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sue Vaughan Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
REV KENNETH PETER JOSEPH PADLEY Chair 07 January 2013 None on record
CHARLES KING Trustee 01 July 2018
THE LIVING ROOM Received: On time
THE LIVING ROOM Received: On time
Bronwen PARR Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
GRAHAM DOUGLAS WILLEY MA CANTAB Trustee None on record
Blessing Johnson Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Barbara Young Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Nigel Voyce Trustee 25 March 2014 None on record
Mark PEDROZ Trustee 25 October 2020 None on record
CHRISTINE SANDRA ALLEN Trustee None on record
PAUL BARNES Trustee
KENTISH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
WEST HERTS ENVIRONMENTAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Billy PITHER Trustee 25 October 2020 None on record
Val Chiesa Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
David Carter Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
RACHEL SARAH NAYLOR LLB Trustee 03 August 2011 None on record
Kevin Keenan Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Lady Dione Verulam Trustee 16 May 2021 None on record
Jane Larman Trustee 12 March 2014 None on record
SUSAN MARGARET DYSON Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record