Financial history TUNBRIDGE WELLS BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1132966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £211.07k £242.11k £296.00k £342.40k £270.54k
Total expenditure £261.02k £241.82k £255.62k £204.45k £631.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A