Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH HAMPSTEAD SQUARE

Charity number: 1133781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CANON PAUL CONRAD Chair
None on record
Robert Andrew Simkin Trustee 21 June 2023
None on record
Jessie Olumayowa Oyinlola Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Yiwei Li Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Karen Maree Harries Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Nicole Emma Lewis Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Rodger Heeley Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
Harmen Van Den Hondel Trustee 10 April 2017
None on record
Joshua Oyinlola Trustee 09 April 2017
None on record
MARTHA COLLINS ROLLE Trustee
None on record
JOHN GOLDSMITH Trustee
HAMPSTEAD COMMUNITY ACTION LIMITED
Received: On time
MICHAEL ROYALTON-KISCH Trustee
None on record