Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALKMUND AND ST WERBURGH, DERBY

Charity number: 1132891
Charity reporting is overdue by 121 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 121 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 121 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window