Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALKMUND AND ST WERBURGH, DERBY

Charity number: 1132891
Charity reporting is overdue by 116 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Fay Price Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Mark Lewis Trustee 26 May 2022
None on record
Rev Alice Wiliemhina Munns Trustee 07 November 2021
ST ALKMUND AND ST WERBURGH WELFARE TRUST
Overdue by 116 days
ST ALKMUND'S CHURCH TRUST
Overdue by 116 days
ST ALKMUND'S WARDENS FUND
Overdue by 116 days
Rev James Durrant Trustee 29 January 2021
None on record
Jonathan Schmidt Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Nichole Stieger Trustee 23 April 2019
ST ALKMUND'S CHURCH TRUST
Overdue by 116 days
ST ALKMUND'S WARDENS FUND
Overdue by 116 days
ST ALKMUND AND ST WERBURGH WELFARE TRUST
Overdue by 116 days
Dr Richard Crowson Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
Jonathan Anthony Middleton Seddon Trustee 23 April 2018
ST ALKMUND AND ST WERBURGH WELFARE TRUST
Overdue by 116 days
Amita Dinmore Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Dan Sanders Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Rosemary Archer Trustee 23 April 2017
None on record
James Meek Trustee 13 April 2016
None on record
Cathy Travis Trustee 24 March 2015
None on record
Alex Lacey Trustee 23 March 2014
None on record
Paul Brian Archer Trustee 23 March 2014
None on record
Jacqueline Haywood Trustee 23 March 2014
None on record
Hugh Craig Trustee
None on record