Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WATERLOO

Charity number: 1132457
Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £351.87k £620.70k £655.48k £790.24k £1.74m
Total expenditure £293.34k £559.91k £708.15k £570.27k £1.23m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £47.23k £73.33k £63.13k £509.29k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £427.36k £451.23k £664.89k £1.53m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £105.10k £124.05k £63.81k £126.47k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £19.47k £23.70k £8.32k £35.27k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £68.78k £56.50k £53.22k £53.95k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £165.86k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £533.24k £663.23k £557.75k £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £26.67k £44.92k £12.51k £72.09k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £1.72k £1.92k £5.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £21.30k £70.35k £11.35k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0