Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, BLACKHEATH

Charity number: 1132894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window