Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, BLACKHEATH

Charity number: 1132894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Edward Fraser Austin Longmer Scrase-Field Chair 28 September 2015
ST JOHN'S (BLACKHEATH) WAR MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION
Received: 144 days late
CHURCH PASTORAL AID SOCIETY
Received: On time
SCRIPTURE UNION
Received: On time
ST JOHN'S (BLACKHEATH) WAR MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Tim Webster Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Louisa Nevison-Andrews Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Julia Wright Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Jeremy Neal Olsen Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Babatunde Akinkugbe Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
KATHARINE ELIZABETH MACKENZIE Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
Samuel Hart Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
KATHERINE MCPHERSON Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
Raki Bogan Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
VICTORIA ADELE ALEXANDER Trustee 28 April 2014
None on record
ANDREW MICHAEL BESWETHERICK Trustee
DEBT CENTRE GREENWICH
Recently registered
Richard Westacott Godden Trustee
THE LONDON CITY MISSION
Received: On time
SCRIPTURE UNION
Received: On time
THE CENTRE FOR ENTERPRISE, MARKETS AND ETHICS
Received: On time
VANESSA JANE LOUISE RATCLIFFE Trustee
None on record