COR MEIBION PONTYPRIDD (PONTYPRIDD MALE CHOIR)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public awareness of Choral Music. To entertain audiences at the same time To safeguard, uphold and preservethe Musical Heritage and alnguage of Wales. To promote the pursuit of Musical Excellence in local schools and encourage the pursuit of Musical excellence at the Welsh College of Music and Drama through an award system Through out Wales, Europe and other parts of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Belgium
- Cyprus
- France
- Germany
- Netherlands
- Poland
- Scotland
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 22 June 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Meredith | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Elwell | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Edwin Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neal Halliday | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.52k | £11.60k | £3.98k | £8.74k | £18.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.37k | £7.33k | £4.95k | £11.30k | £23.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 January 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED DECEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 28 MAY 1971
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ART OF CHORAL MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE PONTYPRIDD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tabor Hall
Vaughan Street
PONTYPRIDD
Mid Glamorgan
CF37 1HR
- Phone:
- 07880570660
- Email:
- choir@malechoir.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window