KINGDOM MANDATE CENTRE

Charity number: 1141042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 06 July 2020 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 06 July 2020 67 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 October 2019 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 14 October 2019 167 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 08 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

08 April 2017 On time Download