Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE ASCENSION, BALHAM HILL
Charity number: 1136105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcus Timothy Gibbs | Chair | 07 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Carol Wannan | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Kiddoo Evans | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luke Oliver Watson | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Brian Aikens | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Campbell | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rev Luke Richard Henry Steven | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Martin Alexander-Dann | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Laming | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Birdwood Archer | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Mark William Gulliford | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Douglas Alasdair Fergusson | Trustee | 13 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Babington Cox | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Rev DOROTHY VICTORIA PENNIECOOKE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.