Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE HANOVER SQUARE

Charity number: 1134811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gary Nigel Eaborn Trustee 13 September 2020
None on record
GRAHAM EDWARD BARNES Trustee 25 April 2018
CHARITY OF MATTHEW TOMLINSON
Received: On time
THE ST GEORGE'S HANOVER SQUARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HYDE PARK PLACE ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
GAVIN CHARLES J ARENDT Trustee 29 April 2017
None on record
Rev ALAN ROBERT LENNOX PIGGOT Trustee 29 April 2017
None on record
DIANA MARY DENNIS Trustee 29 April 2017
None on record
THE REVD DR ALAN WILLIAM MCCORMACK Trustee 29 January 2017
None on record
JANET ST JOHN-AUSTEN Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
George Charles The Earl of Lucan Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
REVD DR RICHARD MALCOLM FERMER Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
CHARLES CHAMBERLAIN STEPHENS Trustee 25 October 2012
None on record
ALICIA MATHER Trustee 25 October 2012
None on record
Stewart James Munro Trustee 28 April 2010
None on record
Rev Roderick Neil Stephen Leece Trustee
CHARITY OF MATTHEW TOMLINSON
Received: On time
THE ST GEORGE'S HANOVER SQUARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HYDE PARK PLACE ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST GEORGES (HANOVER SQUARE) SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE CLEAVER ORDINATION CANDIDATES FUND
Received: On time
MARK ANDREW HEWITT Trustee
CHARITY OF MATTHEW TOMLINSON
Received: On time
THE ST GEORGE'S HANOVER SQUARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HYDE PARK PLACE ESTATE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE AES TRING PARK SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW ALEXANDER JONES Trustee
None on record
ALISTAIR HENRY MILWARD Trustee
None on record
PAMELA YAYRA ATEKPE Trustee
None on record