Financial history ST PAUL'S WALDEN PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1132162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £72.82k £92.78k £81.28k £86.32k £95.07k
Total expenditure £83.49k £92.15k £81.14k £87.38k £93.83k
Income from government contracts £50.20k £73.90k £63.26k £67.21k £78.66k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.54k