Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW GREAT ILFORD
Charity number: 1132483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY DAVID EUGENE HARLEY | Chair | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Roger John Norwood | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MARGARET NORWOOD | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARRY SHORTTE | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN VIRGINIA MATHESON HARLEY | Trustee | 29 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NORMAN WILLS | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SAMMY ZAR | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DUNCAN PATERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE JEAN HOBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL LEROY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev MARIE SEGAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JOAN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOY MORTIMER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAYLEY MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARION PANK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.