THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MORTLAKE WITH EAST SHEEN

Charity number: 1132303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHEILA MCRAE HAMILTON Trustee 20 April 2017 None on record
KATHARINE SUSAN WOODHOUSE MBE Trustee
THE MORTLAKE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Adrienne Emelia Jack Trustee 24 April 2013 None on record
Brenda Mabel Morris Trustee 24 May 2021 None on record
Robert Simpson Davenport Trustee 09 April 2014 None on record
MR John Ancock Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
Peter Philip Halford Trustee 24 April 2013
FRIENDS OF BARNES HOSPITAL Received: On time
Celia Frances Catchpole Trustee 29 September 2020
THE BURDETT-COUTTS, TOWNSHEND AND ST STEPHEN'S SCHOOLS, WESTMINSTER Received: On time
Jean Watson Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
Mary Lynne Jones Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
ROBERT HENRY GERRARD COWHAM Trustee None on record
Dr David Ian Bradshaw Trustee 20 April 2017 None on record
Mary Lorna Gillingham Trustee 23 April 2018 None on record
PERRY DUNCAN CRISPIN NEWENT KITCHEN Trustee 20 April 2017
PUTNEY ARTS THEATRE Received: On time
Rev Jack Alexander Barrow Trustee 20 April 2017
FRIENDS OF FRIENDLESS CHURCHES LIMITED Received: On time
WENDY ANN MOSS Trustee 20 April 2017
THE MOTHERS' UNION (SOUTHWARK DIOCESE) Received: On time
Gregory Robert Culvinor Kyle Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Francis Ring Davies Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
PAUL RUSSENBERGER Trustee None on record
Michael Gerard Stewart Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
Rev ANN LOUISE NICKSON Chair 21 March 2012 None on record
JONATHAN DAVID BLYTHE Trustee
MORTLAKE ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES Received: On time
MORTLAKE RELIEF CHARITY Received: On time